NH HB442 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 44; Eff: 05/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 44; Eff: 05/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for a school's failure to file department of education reports.
Title
Relative to penalties for a school's failure to file department of education reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 44; Eff: 05/17/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 102 |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1168e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 100 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-1168e Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/08/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0383h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 6 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0383h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 6 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0383h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95029670134 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 48 |