NH HB417 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to property restrictions on certain amateur radio antennas.
Title
Relative to property restrictions on certain amateur radio antennas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 34 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 3 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13 |
Same As/Similar To
HB417 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)