NH HB417 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to property restrictions on certain amateur radio antennas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to property restrictions on certain amateur radio antennas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-09-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-09-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-06-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HouseRetained in Committee
2019-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-24HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback