NH HB417 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.468-470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.468-470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the milk producers emergency relief fund.
Title
Making an appropriation to the milk producers emergency relief fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - OTP (Y: 112 N: 239 NV: 48 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.468-470 | |
2011-02-23 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 112-239; House Journal 21, PG.468-470 | |
2011-02-16 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 15, PG.275 | |
2011-02-16 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 23 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.275 | |
2011-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 303 3:30 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 11, PG. 185 |