NH HB400 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain assault offenses, bail eligibility for commission of certain assault offenses, and making a false report to a law enforcement officer.
Title
Relative to certain assault offenses, bail eligibility for commission of certain assault offenses, and making a false report to a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 06/01/2023; Senate Calendar 24A |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0602h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 8 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0602h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 8 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0602h 02/17/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 14 |
Same As/Similar To
HB400 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2023; Senate Journal 16