NH HB395 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consideration of home-share income and exempting rentals of shared facilities from requirements under the real estate practice act.
Title
Relative to consideration of home-share income and exempting rentals of shared facilities from requirements under the real estate practice act.
Sponsors
Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Karen Umberger [R] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 38 |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 17 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91233802944 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 46 |