NH HB391 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 230; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 230; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Applying the E911 surcharge to prepaid cellular telephones.
Title
Applying the E911 surcharge to prepaid cellular telephones.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Introne [R] | Rep. James Devine [R] | Rep. Donald Flanders [R] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] |
Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 167 N: 152 NV: 53 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 230; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-07-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2140 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2298EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2298e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1594s (Rep Introne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1814 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1594s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1594s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1594s, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/22/15, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reconsider (Rep White): Motion Failed DV 125-190; House Journal 26, PG. 1262 |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Halstead): Motion Failed DV 153-166; House Journal 26, PG. 1262 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0360h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-152; House Journal 26, PG. 1258-1262 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0360h: Amendment Adopted DV 200-102; House Journal 26, PG. 1258-1260 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0360h for Mar 11 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 434-435 |
2015-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 221 |