NH HB386 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child passenger restraints.
Title
Relative to child passenger restraints.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 |
2023-02-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 386-FN 02/21/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Transportation |