NH HB377 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2023; Chapter 151; eff: 09/26/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2023; Chapter 151; eff: 09/26/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to screening and intervention in public schools and public charter schools for dyslexia and related disorders, and establishing an addition to adequate education grants for certain pupils screened for dyslexia and related disorders.
Title
Relative to screening and intervention in public schools and public charter schools for dyslexia and related disorders, and establishing an addition to adequate education grants for certain pupils screened for dyslexia and related disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-01 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2023; Chapter 151; eff: 09/26/2023 House Journal 17 |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 16 |
2023-06-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2185e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 14 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2185e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0516h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 2 |
2023-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2023-0516h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 3 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0516h (NT) 03/06/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2023 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 13 |