NH HB377 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-03 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-03 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to marijuana sales.
Title
Relative to marijuana sales.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-10-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-10-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-08-29 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 12 |
Same As/Similar To
HB377 (Carry Over) 2017-11-03 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)