NH HB354 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/27/2017; Chapter 28; Eff. 4/27/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/27/2017; Chapter 28; Eff. 4/27/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the department of education to provide additional adequate education grant payments to certain municipalities.
Title
Making an appropriation to the department of education to provide additional adequate education grant payments to certain municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/27/2017; Chapter 28; Eff. 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 24 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/20/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0850h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment #2017-0850h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0850h for 03/23/2017 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/02/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 25 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0076h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 25 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0076h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 25 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0076h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 9 |