NH HB349 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - II. Remainder Effective 07/30/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to OHRV operation of certain 4-wheel drive vehicles on trails within Jericho Mountain state park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to OHRV operation of certain 4-wheel drive vehicles on trails within Jericho Mountain state park.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-03HouseII. Remainder Effective 07/30/2013
2013-06-03HouseI. Section 3 Effective 01/01/2016
2013-06-03HouseSigned by Governor 05/31/2013; Chapter 0034
2013-04-24HouseEnrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257
2013-04-18SenateEnrolled
2013-04-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg;
2013-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16
2013-03-28SenateHearing: 4/3/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14
2013-03-21SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources
2013-03-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0728h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.841-842
2013-03-20HouseAmendment #0728h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.841-842
2013-03-06HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-0728h; House Calendar 23 PG.615
2013-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0728h for Mar 20 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.579
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.192

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback