NH HB323 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 226; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 226; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of the statewide assessment program.
Title
Relative to the administration of the statewide assessment program.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. James Grenier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 226; Effective Date 9/11/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2314c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2122 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2314c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2015-2314c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-17 | House | ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/18/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Avard Replaces Senator Watters |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 6/15/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207==Recessed== |
2015-06-11 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Bradley and Watters |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sen. Reagan accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18 |
2015-06-05 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Ladd, Cordelli, Wolf, Shaw (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1950 |
2015-06-05 | House | House Non-Concurs and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1950 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1863s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2015-1863s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1465s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1465s, 5/21/15; Senate Calendar 22 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Special Order HB 323 to 5/21/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1465s, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Special Order HB 323 to 5/14/15, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1465s, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: === RECONVENE === 4/16/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: === RECESSED === 4/14/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0806h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1269-1270 |
2015-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2015-0806h (Rep Ladd): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1269-1270 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0612h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1269-1270 |
2015-03-12 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep Ladd); House Journal 24, PG. 766 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0612h for Mar 11 (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 397 |
2015-03-05 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED== |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 217 |