NH HB317 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the treatment of veterans' disability benefits for purposes of determining child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the treatment of veterans' disability benefits for purposes of determining child support.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 4
2021-03-18HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 3
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754
2021-02-09House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/18/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95160795068 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-27House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96640856922 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback