NH HB316 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Div. 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Div. 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulating alkaline hydrolysis for the disposal of human remains.
Title
Relative to regulating alkaline hydrolysis for the disposal of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - LAY ON TABLE (REP KAPPLER) (Y: 82 N: 214 NV: 89 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Div. 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED ===; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 4/17/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin |
2013-03-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0993h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1068-1071 |
2013-03-27 | House | Amendment #0993h: Amendment Adopted Division Vote 264-32; House Journal 31, PG.1068-1071 |
2013-03-27 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Kappler): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 82-214; House Journal 31, PG.1068-1070 |
2013-03-27 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Kappler); House Journal 31, PG.1023 |
2013-03-20 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0993h; House Calendar 25, PG.728-729 |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0993h for Mar 27 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.705 |
2013-03-18 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 3/14/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 24, PG.676 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0344h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 257-113; House Journal 24, PG.676 |
2013-03-06 | House | Amendment #0344h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.676 |
2013-02-21 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0344h; House Calendar 20, PG.449-450 |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0344h for Mar 6 (Vote 15-2; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.418 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.191 |