NH HB297 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 258; Eff. 8/14/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 258; Eff. 8/14/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protecting individual customer data from disclosure by a public utility.
Title
Protecting individual customer data from disclosure by a public utility.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. David Borden [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 258; Eff. 8/14/2016 |
2016-06-07 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 61 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2126e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2126e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1841s (Rep. Introne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 23 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1841s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1841s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1841s, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0295h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 32 |
2016-03-10 | House | FLAM #2016-0295h (Rep. Vose): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 31 |
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 66-244 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 31 |
2016-03-10 | House | Remove from Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 31 |
2016-01-07 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Introne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 41 |
2015-07-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2360h (NT) |
2015-07-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 26 |
2015-06-24 | House | Executive Session: 6/30/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-06-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/23/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |