NH HB282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 235-136 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the authority of fish and game officers to search without a warrant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the authority of fish and game officers to search without a warrant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - ITL (Y: 235 N: 136 NV: 4 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 235-136 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 7
2019-01-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-01-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6
2019-01-10HouseExecutive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-02HousePublic Hearing: 01/09/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building204
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback