NH HB282 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-02 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.672
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to spitting or urinating in an emergency vehicle.
Title
Relative to spitting or urinating in an emergency vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Fleck [R] | Rep. Dino Scala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.672 | |
2011-02-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 2 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.386 | |
2011-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 11, PG. 180 |