NH HB275 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB275
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the governor's power to initiate a state of emergency and various emergency powers.
Title
Relative to the governor's power to initiate a state of emergency and various emergency powers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-08-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/07/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97946186413 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. *The full committee work session will start at the earlier of 1:30pm or 30 minutes following the close of public hearings. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 10:00 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97946186413 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 41 |
Same As/Similar To
HB275 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Executive Session: 11/08/2021 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308