NH HB267 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.415
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the adoption of slot machine gaming in a city or town.
Title
Permitting the adoption of slot machine gaming in a city or town.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.415 | |
2011-02-15 | House Special Order to Feb 16: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 17, PG.378 | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.236 | |
2011-01-30 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2011 Legislative Office Building 301 Following House Session | |
2011-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 11, PG. 180 |