NH HB266 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 125; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 125; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notice and public access requirements for hybrid and virtual agency public comment hearings for rulemaking.
Title
Relative to notice and public access requirements for hybrid and virtual agency public comment hearings for rulemaking.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 125; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17 |
2023-06-20 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 14 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7 |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 9 |