NH HB258 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 257; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 257; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study teacher preparation and education programs.
Title
Establishing a commission to study teacher preparation and education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment 1989s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Sen. Carson Floor Amendment 1975s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Sen. Carson Floor Amendment 1975s (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Sen. Carson Floor Amendment 1975s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Sen. Carson Floor Amendment 1975s (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 257; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/19/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1836s (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1836s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2019-1989s, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2019-1975s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Reconsideration on vote on 2019-1975, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2019-1975s, Regular Calendar 8Y-16N, Amendment Failed; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Special Order to when Senators return from a House hearing, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Offered Floor Amendment # 2019-1975s; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1836s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1836s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 194-145 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 55 |
2019-02-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 28 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43 |