NH HB252 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB252

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 289; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pro se litigants under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pro se litigants under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 289; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 2000c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-2000c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-16SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2000c; 05/16/2018
2018-05-10HouseConference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2018-05-02SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Lasky; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-05-02SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-19HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Hynes, Berch, Sylvia, Janvrin 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2
2018-04-19HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1276s and Requests CofC (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2
2018-04-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1276s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1276s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
2018-04-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1276s, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2018-02-14SenateHearing: 02/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2396h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38
2018-01-03HouseAmendment # 2017-2396h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38
2017-11-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2396h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-09-19HouseExecutive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-06-09HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-06-09HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-06-02HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-28HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 22

Same As/Similar To

HB252 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2396h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback