NH HB252 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2396h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pro se litigants under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pro se litigants under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-15HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2396h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-09-19HouseExecutive Session: 10/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-06-09HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-06-09HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-06-02HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 06/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-28HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208
2016-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback