NH HB247 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 123; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 123; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to protective well radii.
Title
Relative to protective well radii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 123; Eff: 08/29/2023 House Journal 17 |
2023-06-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 15 |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 12 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 8 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 8 |