NH HB228 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB228

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-17SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-09SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2022-02-23SenateHearing: 03/08/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2
2022-01-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-2116h: Motion Adopted DV 189-163 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
2022-01-07HouseAmendment # 2021-2116h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
2021-09-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2116h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 20
2021-08-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-15HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/03/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96640856922 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 40

Same As/Similar To

HB228 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2116h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback