NH HB228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2116h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2116h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.
Title
Relative to the calculation of child support in cases with equal or approximately equal parenting time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2116h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96640856922 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB228 (Carry Over) 2021-09-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2116h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar)