NH HB224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 325; Eff: 10/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Making emergency medical technicians and rescue squad members eligible for a death benefit if killed in the line of duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making emergency medical technicians and rescue squad members eligible for a death benefit if killed in the line of duty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 325; Eff: 10/15/2019
2019-07-29HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59
2019-07-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-07-09HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2651e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 55
2019-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2651e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1653s (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3
2019-05-24SenateSpecial Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1653s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1653s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1653s, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-02SenateHearing: 04/10/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 26
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 9
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-02-15HouseFinance-Division I Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Finance 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 12
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0006h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 11
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0006h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 11
2019-01-30HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0006h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 6
2019-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building306
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback