NH HB210 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/25/2017; Chapter 22; Eff. 6/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/25/2017; Chapter 22; Eff. 6/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a code of ethics for certified educational personnel.
Title
Relative to a code of ethics for certified educational personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] |
Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/25/2017; Chapter 22; Eff. 6/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1308e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 62 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1308e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0559h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 19 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0559h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 19 |
2017-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0559h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/22/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/18/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 20 |