NH HB208 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Signed by Governor 05/08/2013; Effective 07/07/2013; Chapter 0013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Signed by Governor 05/08/2013; Effective 07/07/2013; Chapter 0013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annual reports of county officers.
Title
Relative to annual reports of county officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor 05/08/2013; Effective 07/07/2013; Chapter 0013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1192 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled 3/28/13 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/21/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/13/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.331 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 13 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.210 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 1/31/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.187 |