NH HB201 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-151 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-151 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.
Title
Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - ITL (Y: 221 N: 151 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-151 02/16/2017 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2017-02-15 | House | Special Order to first order of business on 2/16/2017 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2017-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 24 |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 20 |