NH HB200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to serologic testing including Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to serologic testing including Lyme disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14
2019-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 10
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-30HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:15 pm Reps Hall
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback