NH HB20 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a bridge in the town of Merrimack for the Honorable Richard "Dick" Hinch.
Title
Naming a bridge in the town of Merrimack for the Honorable Richard "Dick" Hinch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 356 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 356 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 356 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | House | Special Order HB20 (Rep. Notter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 356-4 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/03/2023 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 25 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Public Works and Highways |