NH HB185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-134 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-134 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to contingently reducing the rate of the interest and dividends tax and repealing the tax in 5 years.
Title
Relative to contingently reducing the rate of the interest and dividends tax and repealing the tax in 5 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 207 N: 134 NV: 41 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-134 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 75 |
2019-02-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0002h |
2019-02-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 20 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 40 |