NH HB183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study costs of requests for information under the right-to-know law.
Title
Establishing a commission to study costs of requests for information under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/26/2017 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 19 |