NH HB1819 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 357; I. Sec 9;13 and 15 eff 07/01/2018 at 12:01 a.m.;II. Sec 4;11;12;17;18;19 eff as prov in sec 20;III. Rem eff 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 357; I. Sec 9;13 and 15 eff 07/01/2018 at 12:01 a.m.;II. Sec 4;11;12;17;18;19 eff as prov in sec 20;III. Rem eff 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administration of the education tax credit.
Title
Relative to administration of the education tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 303 N: 42 NV: 18 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 357; I. Sec 9;13 and 15 eff 07/01/2018 at 12:01 a.m.;II. Sec 4;11;12;17;18;19 eff as prov in sec 20;III. Rem eff 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-28 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2124e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2124e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1901s (Reps. Ladd, Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1901s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1901s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1053h and 1175h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 51 |
2018-03-22 | House | FLAM # 2018-1175h (Rep. Lang): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 51 |
2018-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-1053h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 51 |
2018-03-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Ladd) 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 2 |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1053h for 03/21/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 4 |
2018-03-14 | House | Executive Session: 03/12/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-03-12 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/12/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-02-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 28 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0295h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 303-42 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 25 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0295h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 25 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0295h for 02/07/2018 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 21 |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 24 |