NH HB1818 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for certain occupational licensing violations.
Title
Relative to penalties for certain occupational licensing violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - Interim Study (Y: 211 N: 93 NV: 45 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-03-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-93 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 67 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 68 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/27/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-02-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-12 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 24 |