NH HB1797 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-94 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-94 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding a 50 percent charge to all amounts assessed to persons liable for costs of containment, cleanup, and remediation of water, air and soil pollution.
Title
Adding a 50 percent charge to all amounts assessed to persons liable for costs of containment, cleanup, and remediation of water, air and soil pollution.
Sponsors
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 94 NV: 79 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-94 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78 |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 26 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/23/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/16/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-12-08 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 24 |