NH HB1777 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 93; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to energy infrastructure corridor revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to energy infrastructure corridor revenue.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 93; Eff. 7/24/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:25 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 52
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 30
2018-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 201
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Public Works and Highways 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 12
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 12
2018-01-23HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 15
2018-01-10HouseExecutive Session: 01/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2018-01-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback