NH HB1767 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a multiple employer public retirement plan.
Title
Establishing a multiple employer public retirement plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-03-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 23 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-22 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 22 |