NH HB1754 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 249-72 03/06/2018 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 249-72 03/06/2018 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state defined contribution retirement plan for state and political subdivision members of the retirement system.
Title
Establishing a state defined contribution retirement plan for state and political subdivision members of the retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 249-72 03/06/2018 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 54 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 22 |