NH HB1707 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - House Signed By Governor 05/23/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to penalties for operation after revocation or suspension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to penalties for operation after revocation or suspension.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 House Signed By Governor 05/23/2012; Effective 01/01/2013; Chapter 0077
2012-05-15 House Enrolled; House Journal 43, PG.2345
2012-05-09 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 14, Pg.511
2012-05-02 Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.471
2012-04-24 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17
2012-04-11 Senate Hearing: 4/19/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2012-03-28 Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9, Pg.335
2012-03-08 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1426
2012-02-23 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 7 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1090
2012-02-15 House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2012-01-18 House Public Hearing: 1/25/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2012-01-04 House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG.365

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback