NH HB1701 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Lay HB 1701 on Table (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted DV 238-94 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making the Coakley Landfill Group subject to the provisions of RSA 91-A.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making the Coakley Landfill Group subject to the provisions of RSA 91-A.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseLay HB 1701 on Table (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted DV 238-94 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 23
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 72
2018-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-11-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback