NH HB1695 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1621s, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1621s, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the release of student personally identifiable information.
Title
Relative to the release of student personally identifiable information.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 173 NV: 8 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1621s, 05/02/2024, Vote 3-1; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Reconsider HB1695 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 170-195 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0641h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-173 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0641h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/13/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 19 |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |