NH HB1686 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0667h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Medicaid to schools program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Medicaid to schools program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0667h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-12HouseAmendment # 2020-0667h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-02-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0667h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 50
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 31

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback