NH HB1673 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter ; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter ; Eff. 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain provisions of the fetal life protection act requiring an ultrasound examination.
Title
Relative to certain provisions of the fetal life protection act requiring an ultrasound examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 163 N: 165 NV: 35 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/20/2022; Chapter ; Eff. 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/14/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0688h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2022-0688h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-20 | House | Amendment # 0370h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 163-165 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0688h |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0730h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2022 01:00 pm State House Reps Hall |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |