NH HB1661 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Reconsider (Rep. Oxenham): Motion Failed DV 105-244 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Reconsider (Rep. Oxenham): Motion Failed DV 105-244 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the exemption from property taxes for water and air pollution control facilities.
Title
Relative to the exemption from property taxes for water and air pollution control facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - ITL (Y: 203 N: 127 NV: 41 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Oxenham): Motion Failed DV 105-244 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 9 |
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-127 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 79 |
2020-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 25 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-18 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 30 |