NH HB1658 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - House Conference Committee Report #2444c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - House Conference Committee Report #2444c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an income and identity verification system for public assistance recipients; relative to implementation of the Sean William Corey pilot program; and extending the moratorium on nursing home beds and rehabilitation beds.
Title
Establishing an income and identity verification system for public assistance recipients; relative to implementation of the Sean William Corey pilot program; and extending the moratorium on nursing home beds and rehabilitation beds.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - OTP/AM 1376H(NT) (Y: 245 N: 84 NV: 41 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2444c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2604 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2444c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-31 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2012-2444c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2012-05-30 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Bragdon Replaces Senator D’Allesandro | |
2012-05-30 | House Conferee Change: Rep Kappler Replaces Rep Garcia; House Journal 47, PG.2507 | |
2012-05-29 | House Conferee Change: Rep R.Barry Replaces Rep Elliott; House Journal 46, PG.2496 | |
2012-05-29 | House ==RECONVENE== Conference Committee Meeting: 5/30/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 | |
2012-05-24 | House Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Morse, D'Allesandro, and Forrester | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Morse Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference ; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-17 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps T.Keane, Garcia, W.Smith, Elliott; House Journal 46, PG.2491 | |
2012-05-17 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #2222s(NT) and #2333s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2491 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2222s, New Title, 2333, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2012-2333s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Without Objection Rule 3-7 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 2333s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on HB 1658, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Bragdon Moved to Rescind OT3rdg | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2222s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.525 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2012-2285s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.525 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 2222s, New Title; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.524 | |
2012-05-10 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-2222s, New Title, 5/16/12; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Hearing: 5/3/12, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 9, Pg.335 | |
2012-03-28 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1376h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 245-84; House Journal 30, PG.1829-1834 | |
2012-03-28 | House Amendment #1376h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1829-1832 | |
2012-03-28 | House Special Order to Next Bill (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1829 | |
2012-03-22 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 25, PG.1510 | |
2012-03-22 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2012-1376h (New Title); House Calendar 25, PG.1592-1594 | |
2012-03-22 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1376h(NT) for Mar 28 (Vote 20-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.1510 | |
2012-03-15 | House Executive Session: 3/20/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-03-15 | House Public Hearing on Non-Germane Amendment #2012-1279h(NT): 3/20/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==Work Session May Follow== | |
2012-02-29 | House ==CANCELLED== Work Session: 3/19/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-21 | House ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 3/13/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-14 | House ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 3/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-08 | House Suspend House Rules to Allow Reporting Deadline to be Extended to March 22, 2012: Motion Adopted Voice Vote by Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 15, PG.848 | |
2012-01-31 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/7/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-01-11 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/26/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-01-03 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-12-23 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 7, PG.363 |