NH HB1657 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement of court-ordered services for juveniles.
Title
Relative to reimbursement of court-ordered services for juveniles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 97 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 97 |
2020-03-11 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 213-121 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 97 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 34 |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing: 03/03/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-13 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 30 |