NH HB1645 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted 232-122; House Journal 18, PG.992-994
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted 232-122; House Journal 18, PG.992-994
Summary
Relative to freedom of choice on whether to join a labor union.
Title
Relative to freedom of choice on whether to join a labor union.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Dudley Dumaine [R] | Rep. Warren Groen [R] | Rep. Walter Kolodziej [R] |
Rep. William Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted 232-122; House Journal 18, PG.992-994 | |
2010-02-17 | House Recommit (Rep Vaillancourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 102-249; House Journal 18, PG.992 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Beginning of Feb 17 Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-01-28 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 10 Regular Calendar (vote 12-1); House Calendar 13, PG.539 | |
2010-01-22 | House Executive Session: 1/28/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2010-01-21 | House ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2010 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2010-01-07 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Representative's Hall | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2104&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |